U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00555-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HEMPHILL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Access]
  • June 07, 2022: [Access]
  • June 03, 2022: [Transcript]
  • June 03, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • June 03, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • June 02, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • June 02, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Convert Hearing]
  • May 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 18, 2022: [Convert Hearing]
  • May 16, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 26, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • January 21, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • January 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 21, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 11, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 07, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • September 20, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 20, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 20, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 17, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 15, 2021: [.Order]
  • September 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 02, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.