U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00585-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MCLEAN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 24, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 20, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Exclude]
  • September 21, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 09, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 09, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 09, 2021: [Temporary Detention ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 09, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 02, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.