U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00583-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JENKINS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 22, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • December 22, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • December 22, 2021: [Temporary Detention ]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 10, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • September 10, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 10, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 10, 2021: [Exclude]
  • September 10, 2021: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • September 10, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 10, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 10, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • September 02, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.