U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00551-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FAIRCHILD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 24, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • October 21, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • October 18, 2022: [Witness List]
  • October 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 13, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 04, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • May 11, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • May 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 11, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • May 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Indictment]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 06, 2021: [.Order]
November, 2021
  • November 06, 2021: [Status Report]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Status Report]
  • October 15, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 15, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 27, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 14, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 08, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 08, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 08, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 02, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.