U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00561-1
  • Case Name: USA v. O'BRIEN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • October 18, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • October 13, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • October 13, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order]
  • October 07, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 02, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 02, 2021: [Exclude]
  • September 02, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 02, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 02, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.