U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00550-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GASSAWAY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • March 01, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 15, 2021: [Statement of Offense]
  • December 15, 2021: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • December 14, 2021: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • December 14, 2021: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • November 18, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 16, 2021: [Response to motion]
  • November 11, 2021: [Reconsideration ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • November 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 21, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • October 18, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • October 18, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 18, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • October 18, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 07, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 21, 2021: [Transcript]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • September 16, 2021: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • September 13, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 10, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 10, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 10, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 10, 2021: [Hearing ]
  • September 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 10, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
  • September 10, 2021: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • September 10, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 10, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • September 02, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.