U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00589-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GAMBOA-SAENZ et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Commitment to Another District]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • October 19, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Transfer Out]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • September 23, 2021: [Dismiss Case]
  • September 20, 2021: [.Order]
  • September 17, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 17, 2021: [.Order]
  • September 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 08, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 08, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 08, 2021: [.Order]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 08, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Temporary Detention ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 08, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 03, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 03, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 03, 2021: [Arrest - Rule 5]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.