U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00584-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GLEFFE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2021: [Exclude]
  • October 07, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 10, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 08, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 08, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.