U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00566-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DEMPSEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice of Courtroom Change]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 17, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Exclude]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 17, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 12, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • November 16, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Clarify]
  • November 09, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 08, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 08, 2021: [Protective Order ]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 18, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 30, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 30, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 30, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 30, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 30, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 24, 2021: [.Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 09, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.