U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00564-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DASILVA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • January 16, 2023: [Dismiss Count(s)]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • December 19, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 06, 2022: [Dismiss Count(s)]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Exclude]
  • June 07, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Indictment]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • January 06, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Exclude]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 29, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 29, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 29, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • September 27, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • September 27, 2021: [Standing Order]
  • September 20, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 14, 2021: [.Order]
  • September 09, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.