U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00587-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LOLLIS, JR
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • November 09, 2021: [Status Report]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 22, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 09, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.