U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00562-1
  • Case Name: USA v.MARTIN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Modifying Conditions of Release]
  • December 05, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
November, 2022
  • November 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 25, 2022: [Vacate]
  • November 25, 2022: [Exclude]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 17, 2022: [Exclude]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 29, 2022: [Vacate]
  • June 29, 2022: [Exclude]
  • June 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Indictment]
November, 2021
  • November 06, 2021: [Status Report]
  • November 04, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Status Report]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order Modifying Conditions of Release]
  • October 19, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 19, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 19, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • October 04, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Disclosure ]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 14, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 14, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 10, 2021: [.Order]
  • September 09, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.