U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00579-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SIZER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • October 07, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 05, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 13, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 13, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 13, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 13, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.