U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00571-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MANDEVILLE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • December 29, 2021: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
  • December 15, 2021: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • December 15, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 09, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • December 08, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 05, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [.Order]
  • September 22, 2021: [Statement of Offense]
  • September 22, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 22, 2021: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • September 22, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 22, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 22, 2021: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • September 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 13, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.