U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00596-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WILSON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 30, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 30, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 29, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 27, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 15, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Pretrial Memorandum]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 14, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 02, 2021: [Exclude]
  • November 01, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 25, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 26, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • September 21, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 16, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 16, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 15, 2021: [.Order]
  • September 14, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 14, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • September 14, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.