U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00575-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LESPERANCE et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 13, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 15, 2022: [Payment of Fee- Pro Hac Vice Motion]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • June 06, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 06, 2022: [Errata]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • May 02, 2022: [Disclosure ]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Redacted Document]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • December 10, 2021: [Status Report]
  • December 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • November 04, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 04, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 04, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 04, 2021: [Protective Order ]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Standing Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 24, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 14, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.