U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00576-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ROSEBERRY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Transcript]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 06, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Transcript]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions for High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 02, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 12, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • July 08, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • July 05, 2022: [Reconsideration ]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [.Order]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 05, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 24, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 24, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 24, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 24, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.