U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00598-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CAO
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 16, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 16, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 16, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 16, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 15, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.