U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00581-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WIEDRICH
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • February 01, 2022: [Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Transcript]
  • January 20, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • January 13, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 15, 2021: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • October 14, 2021: [Statement of Offense]
  • October 14, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 14, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 14, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 14, 2021: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 16, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.