U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00579-1
  • Case Name: USA v. STRAKA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Transcript]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Permit]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • January 18, 2023: [Unseal Document]
  • January 18, 2023: [Leave to File Document ]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Access]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Status Conference]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 26, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Transcript]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 24, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Access]
  • January 21, 2022: [Access]
  • January 20, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 18, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 14, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 13, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 17, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 06, 2021: [Statement of Offense]
  • October 06, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 06, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 06, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 06, 2021: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • October 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 05, 2021: [Information - Felony]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Appear]
  • September 30, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 17, 2021: [.Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.