U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00580-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BALLESTEROS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Permit]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Permit]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • March 14, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • March 14, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • January 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Vacate]
  • January 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Statement of Offense]
  • October 28, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 28, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 28, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 28, 2021: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • October 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 13, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2021: [Stipulation]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [.Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.