U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00582-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SUSSMANN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Transcript]
  • June 02, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • June 01, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Verdict Form ]
  • May 31, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 31, 2022: [~Util- Jury Verdict]
  • May 31, 2022: [Signature of Foreperson..... (STAYS SEALED)]
  • May 31, 2022: [Jury Notes ]
  • May 31, 2022: [Attorneys' Acknowledgment of Trial Exhibits]
  • May 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 25, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 25, 2022: [Permit]
  • May 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 22, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • May 19, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • May 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 19, 2022: [Declaration of Mistrial ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Strike ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Minute Order for Jury Meals]
  • May 16, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • May 13, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 12, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 12, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 11, 2022: [Exclude]
  • May 09, 2022: [Proposed Verdict Form]
  • May 09, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • May 09, 2022: [Transcript]
  • May 09, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • May 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 07, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • May 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • May 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 05, 2022: [Transcript]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 02, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 02, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 28, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 28, 2022: [Transcript]
  • April 27, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • April 26, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 25, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • April 25, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 22, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • April 22, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • April 21, 2022: [Transcript]
  • April 20, 2022: [Errata]
  • April 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 19, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 19, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • April 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • April 15, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • April 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 08, 2022: [Exclude]
  • April 06, 2022: [Compel]
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • April 06, 2022: [Transcript]
  • April 04, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • April 04, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 11, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • March 10, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 09, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • March 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to]
  • March 04, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 17, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • February 17, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • February 14, 2022: [Strike ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • February 11, 2022: [Hearing ]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 25, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Transcript]
  • December 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 07, 2021: [Response to motion]
  • December 06, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Clarify]
  • October 28, 2021: [Transcript]
  • October 25, 2021: [Reply to Opposition]
  • October 20, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • October 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 06, 2021: [Bill of Particulars ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Transcript]
  • September 22, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 22, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 17, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 17, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 17, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 16, 2021: [.Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.