U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00593-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FASSELL et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 23, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 16, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 16, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 16, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 16, 2021: [.Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.