U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00585-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RAHM, III
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 02, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 29, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Indictment]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike ]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 31, 2022: [Status Report]
  • March 31, 2022: [Exclude]
  • March 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Strike ]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Status Report]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Status Conference]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 29, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 29, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 12, 2021: [Status Report]
  • November 12, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 01, 2021: [Indictment]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Status Report]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • September 28, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • September 28, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • September 20, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.