U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00587-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SCHUBERT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • March 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 09, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 04, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • March 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • February 24, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 16, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 09, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 09, 2021: [Statement of Offense]
  • December 09, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 09, 2021: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • December 09, 2021: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • December 09, 2021: [Referred for PSI Report]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 24, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 24, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 24, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 24, 2021: [.Order]
  • September 21, 2021: [.Order]
  • September 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 20, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.