U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00574-1
  • Case Name: USA v. VERBEECK
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Status Report]
  • January 17, 2023: [Travel ]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Status Report]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Status Report]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 18, 2021: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • October 18, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 18, 2021: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • October 18, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 18, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 18, 2021: [Deferred of PSI Report]
  • October 18, 2021: [Bond Set/Reset]
  • October 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 20, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.