U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00592-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BUCKLER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Status Report]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 17, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 18, 2021: [Exclude]
  • November 17, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 05, 2021: [Status Report]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Status Report]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 15, 2021: [Protective Order ]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 20, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 20, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 20, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 20, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 20, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 20, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • September 20, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.