U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00584-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GASKINS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 15, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 22, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • August 19, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 03, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • August 03, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 03, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • August 03, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • August 03, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • January 21, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 01, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 23, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 22, 2021: [.Order]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 30, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 30, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • September 29, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • September 29, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • September 29, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • September 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 27, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 27, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 27, 2021: [Temporary Detention ]
  • September 27, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 27, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 27, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 22, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • September 21, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.