U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00600-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SARGENT
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 28, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 27, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • September 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 23, 2021: [.Order]
  • September 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 21, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 21, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.