U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00589-1
  • Case Name: USA v. IRWIN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 03, 2024: [Joinder]
  • October 03, 2024: [Reply in Support]
  • October 02, 2024: [Reply in Support]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 13, 2023: [In Limine ]
  • January 12, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 11, 2023: [Response to motion]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 11, 2023: [Indictment]
  • January 11, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Response to motion]
  • January 10, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 04, 2023: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 14, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • November 14, 2022: [Waiver]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 09, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Response to motion]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Dismiss Count(s)]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 06, 2022: [Indictment]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Exclude]
  • April 18, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • March 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 22, 2022: [Exclude]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Status Conference]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 01, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • November 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 01, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 01, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 19, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • October 13, 2021: [Protective Order ]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.