U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00609-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GLOVER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 07, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 05, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • April 04, 2022: [Reconsideration ]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Exclude]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • February 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 17, 2022: [Exclude]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Transcript]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 10, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 09, 2021: [Transcript]
  • December 08, 2021: [Transcript]
  • December 08, 2021: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 22, 2021: [Reply to Opposition]
  • November 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 18, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Review]
  • November 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 15, 2021: [Review]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions for High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • November 15, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 15, 2021: [Stay]
  • November 12, 2021: [Response to motion]
  • November 10, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 09, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [Reconsideration ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 01, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 01, 2021: [Exclude]
  • October 01, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • September 27, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 27, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
  • September 27, 2021: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • September 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • September 23, 2021: [~Util - Medical/Mental Health Alert]
  • September 23, 2021: [Temporary Detention ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 23, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • September 22, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.