U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00591-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CHAN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • October 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 01, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 22, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 22, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • September 21, 2021: [.Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.