U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00595-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DAVIS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • November 09, 2022: [Status Conference]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Exclude]
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • July 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Exclude]
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Exclude]
  • May 05, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 08, 2022: [Exclude]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 10, 2022: [Status Report]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Indictment]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • January 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 11, 2022: [Exclude]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order]
  • October 22, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • October 15, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 15, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 15, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 22, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.