U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00569-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BENTON et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • December 15, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • December 01, 2022: [Acquittal ]
  • December 01, 2022: [New Trial ]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 17, 2022: [Signature of Foreperson..... (STAYS SEALED)]
  • November 17, 2022: [Verdict Form ]
  • November 17, 2022: [~Util- Jury Verdict]
  • November 17, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 16, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • November 15, 2022: [Attorneys' Acknowledgment of Trial Exhibits]
  • November 15, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Jury Instructions ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 10, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 09, 2022: [Minute Order for Jury Meals]
  • November 09, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • November 06, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 27, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • October 26, 2022: [Trial Brief ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • October 14, 2022: [Statement of Case]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Transcript]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • September 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 23, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone]
  • September 09, 2022: [Appear by Telephone]
  • September 09, 2022: [Reply in Support]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • August 19, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • August 19, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • August 01, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice of Error]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • July 29, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • July 29, 2022: [In Limine ]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 02, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Compel]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 22, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 10, 2022: [.Order]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • December 23, 2021: [Dismiss Case]
  • December 17, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 05, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 01, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • September 27, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 22, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 22, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 22, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 22, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.