U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00596-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KRZYWICKI et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Errata]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • April 26, 2022: [Modify]
  • April 22, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • April 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 22, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • April 22, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 21, 2022: [Errata]
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 14, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 08, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Status Report]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • January 11, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • January 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 11, 2022: [Submission to the Court in Preparation for Upcoming Plea Hearing]
  • January 11, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • January 11, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • January 11, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 04, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Status Report]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 25, 2021: [Status Report]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • October 05, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 05, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order]
  • October 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 29, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 26, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 26, 2021: [.Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 23, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 23, 2021: [.Order]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order]
  • September 23, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.