U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00594-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HAYNES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 24, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 23, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 01, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • October 31, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • October 31, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 29, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 11, 2022: [Proposed Briefing Schedule]
  • July 11, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • July 07, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Exclude]
  • June 16, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 13, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • June 01, 2022: [Modify]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 06, 2022: [Indictment]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • April 29, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 29, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 29, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • April 29, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • April 29, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [.Order]
  • September 23, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.