U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00590-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SALAAM
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 01, 2022: [Exclude]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 27, 2022: [Exclude]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [.Order]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 27, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • December 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 10, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • December 10, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 10, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 10, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 10, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
  • December 10, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • December 10, 2021: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • December 08, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 23, 2021: [Competency Hearing]
  • November 23, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 26, 2021: [Status Report]
  • October 06, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 24, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.