U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00597-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ALGREDO VAZQUEZ
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Transcript]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Order on Motion to Stay]
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Response to Order of the Court]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Substitute]
  • December 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 24, 2022: [Extension of Time to]
  • October 21, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 28, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • September 14, 2022: [Status Report]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 14, 2022: [Proposed Briefing Schedule]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • January 18, 2022: [Protective Order ]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 28, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Protective Order ]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 29, 2021: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • September 29, 2021: [~Util - Defendant Committed]
  • September 29, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 28, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • September 28, 2021: [Standing Order]
  • September 28, 2021: [Reply in Support]
  • September 27, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • September 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 27, 2021: [Transcript]
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 24, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • September 24, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • September 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 24, 2021: [Reconsideration ]
  • September 24, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
  • September 24, 2021: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • September 24, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • September 24, 2021: [.Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 23, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.