U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00598-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SUTTON, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Leave to File Denied]
January, 2025
  • January 23, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 10, 2024: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • October 10, 2024: [Judgment]
  • October 09, 2024: [Transcript]
  • October 09, 2024: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 03, 2024: [Leave to File Denied]
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Transcript]
  • January 12, 2023: [.Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 09, 2023: [Jury Instructions ]
  • January 03, 2023: [.Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [Proposed Briefing Schedule]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Attorneys' Acknowledgment of Trial Exhibits]
  • December 22, 2022: [Verdict Form ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Signature of Foreperson..... (STAYS SEALED)]
  • December 22, 2022: [Jury Notes ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 22, 2022: [~Util- Jury Verdict]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 20, 2022: [Signature of Foreperson..... (STAYS SEALED)]
  • December 20, 2022: [Jury Notes ]
  • December 20, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • December 19, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [Jury Deliberation]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 15, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 15, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • December 13, 2022: [Reconsideration ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 12, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • December 11, 2022: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • December 11, 2022: [Trial Brief ]
  • December 11, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • December 10, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • December 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 10, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • December 10, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 09, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 08, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 08, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 08, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • December 07, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 07, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 06, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • December 05, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 04, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • December 03, 2022: [In Limine ]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • November 30, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 29, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • November 29, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • November 28, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • November 27, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • November 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 27, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • November 26, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • November 24, 2022: [Reconsideration ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • November 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 18, 2022: [Sanctions ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 16, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 16, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • November 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 15, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 13, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • November 12, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • November 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 11, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 09, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • November 08, 2022: [Compel]
  • November 07, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 04, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 03, 2022: [Writ ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 03, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 02, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • November 02, 2022: [Stay]
  • November 02, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Trial Brief ]
  • October 28, 2022: [Minute Order for Jury Meals]
  • October 27, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 25, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 23, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • October 22, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 20, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • October 20, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 19, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 18, 2022: [Jury Selection - Do Not Use If Jurors Sworn/Trial Began]
  • October 18, 2022: [Transcript]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 14, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 14, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • October 14, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 13, 2022: [Transcript]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Compel]
  • October 12, 2022: [Exclude]
  • October 11, 2022: [Status Report]
  • October 11, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • October 10, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • October 10, 2022: [Leave to Join]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 04, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • October 04, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • October 04, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 03, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 30, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • September 28, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 27, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • September 27, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • September 27, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 22, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Sanctions ]
  • September 20, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • September 20, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • September 19, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • September 16, 2022: [Transcript]
  • September 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 12, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • September 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 08, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Suppress]
  • September 07, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Transcript]
  • September 05, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • September 01, 2022: [.Order]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Reconsideration ]
  • August 31, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • August 30, 2022: [Transcript]
  • August 29, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 23, 2022: [Transcript]
  • August 23, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 22, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • August 22, 2022: [Compel]
  • August 21, 2022: [Compel]
  • August 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • August 16, 2022: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 12, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 12, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • August 08, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • August 08, 2022: [Transcript]
  • August 05, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • August 04, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 04, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • August 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 03, 2022: [Transcript]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 01, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • August 01, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 25, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • July 25, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 25, 2022: [Status Report]
  • July 22, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • July 22, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • July 22, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • July 21, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • July 21, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • July 20, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • July 20, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • July 15, 2022: [Modify]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ]
  • July 13, 2022: [File Excess Pages]
  • July 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to]
  • July 05, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 01, 2022: [.Order]
  • July 01, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 29, 2022: [Dismiss Count(s)]
  • June 27, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • June 27, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • June 27, 2022: [Reconsideration ]
  • June 14, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 10, 2022: [Status Report]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to]
  • June 02, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • June 02, 2022: [.Order]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • May 23, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • May 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 09, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • May 04, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Status Report]
  • April 22, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • April 22, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 22, 2022: [Status Report]
  • April 21, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • April 21, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 13, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • April 13, 2022: [Status Report]
  • April 12, 2022: [Compel]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • April 11, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • April 07, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 16, 2022: [Compel]
  • March 03, 2022: [Transcript]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • February 25, 2022: [Status Report]
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Filing Redacted Document]
  • February 18, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • February 18, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • February 18, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • February 17, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • February 17, 2022: [Compel]
  • February 16, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • February 16, 2022: [Bill of Particulars ]
  • February 16, 2022: [Sanctions ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Compel]
  • February 09, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • February 04, 2022: [.Order]
  • February 04, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 25, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 19, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • January 11, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • January 05, 2022: [Bill of Particulars ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • January 05, 2022: [Disqualify Counsel]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 21, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • December 20, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • December 20, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 20, 2021: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 17, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
  • December 17, 2021: [Extension of Time to]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Disqualify Counsel]
  • December 13, 2021: [Supplement to any document]
  • December 13, 2021: [Reply in Support]
  • December 13, 2021: [Reply to Opposition]
  • December 13, 2021: [Reconsideration ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Modify]
  • December 13, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • December 13, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • December 13, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 13, 2021: [Disqualify Counsel]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Reply to Opposition]
  • November 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • October 15, 2021: [Compel]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 07, 2021: [Status Report]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order Modifying Conditions of Release]
  • October 06, 2021: [Transcript]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 04, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • October 04, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 04, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 03, 2021: [Reply to Opposition]
  • October 03, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • October 03, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 02, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • October 02, 2021: [Compel]
  • October 02, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 29, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • September 28, 2021: [.Order]
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 27, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 27, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 27, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 27, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 27, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 27, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • September 27, 2021: [Seal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.