U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00592-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WIERSMA et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • November 29, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • November 20, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Error]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • August 31, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 31, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • August 31, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • August 31, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • August 30, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • August 30, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 30, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • August 30, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • August 30, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • August 07, 2022: [Transcript]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Exclude]
  • April 11, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 15, 2022: [.Order]
  • March 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 12, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 14, 2022: [Exclude]
  • February 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Exclude]
  • December 21, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 16, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 13, 2021: [Exclude]
  • December 13, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Stipulation]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 06, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 14, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 14, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 14, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 14, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • October 13, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 07, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • October 07, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • October 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 04, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 01, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 01, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • October 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 01, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • October 01, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 27, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.