U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00607-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WATROUS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • October 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 05, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 05, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 05, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • October 05, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 05, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 04, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 28, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • September 28, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.