U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00602-1
  • Case Name: USA v. OWENS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 28, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • August 24, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 15, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • June 17, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 09, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 20, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 25, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Order for Routine Processing]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Statement of Offense]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order for Routine Processing]
  • October 20, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 20, 2021: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • October 20, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 20, 2021: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • October 20, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 28, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.