U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00600-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PROVIDENCE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Re-entry Progress Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • June 06, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • May 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 19, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • February 25, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • February 25, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • February 25, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • February 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Protective Order ]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 02, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 20, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 30, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 30, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 30, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • September 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 28, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 28, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 28, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 28, 2021: [Temporary Detention ]
  • September 28, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • September 28, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.