U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00603-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CUNNINGHAM
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • August 29, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Transcript]
  • July 07, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • July 07, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 17, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • March 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 15, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • February 15, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • February 15, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • October 14, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • October 14, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 14, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 14, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 14, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • October 13, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • October 13, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • October 06, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.