U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00601-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TICAS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Return of Passport ]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Access]
  • September 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 19, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • September 19, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 19, 2022: [Access]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • July 18, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 18, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 13, 2022: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • July 11, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • July 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • April 26, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • April 26, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • April 26, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • April 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 26, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 01, 2021: [Notice of Proposed Order]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 24, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 18, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • October 01, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • October 01, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 01, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 01, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • September 30, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 30, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • September 30, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order]
  • September 30, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • September 29, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 29, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 29, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 29, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 29, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.