U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00591-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SARKO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Transcript]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • May 24, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 29, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • April 26, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • April 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 24, 2022: [Vacate]
  • January 21, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 12, 2021: [Statement of Offense]
  • November 12, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 12, 2021: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • November 12, 2021: [Referred for PSI Report]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 19, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 01, 2021: [.Order]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.