U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00604-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SLAEKER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Transcript]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 12, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • December 05, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • June 10, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • June 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • June 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 10, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Exclude]
  • May 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 25, 2022: [Status Report]
  • February 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Status Conference]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 01, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • October 29, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 28, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 28, 2021: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • October 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 18, 2021: [Transcript]
  • October 04, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 04, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 04, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 04, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • October 04, 2021: [Status Report]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Status Report]
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • September 29, 2021: [Status Report]
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 29, 2021: [.Order]
  • September 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 29, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.