U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00606-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WICKERSHAM
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Access]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 07, 2022: [Access]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Transcript]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • December 23, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 21, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • December 20, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • December 20, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 13, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Statement of Offense]
  • October 15, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 15, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 15, 2021: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • October 15, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 08, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 08, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.