U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00607-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GETSINGER, JR et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 04, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • August 04, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 02, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • August 02, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Sentencing]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 03, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 07, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • December 02, 2021: [Statement of Offense]
  • December 02, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 02, 2021: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • December 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 02, 2021: [Referred for PSI Report]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 25, 2021: [Standing Order]
  • October 06, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 06, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 06, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 06, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 01, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 01, 2021: [Information - Felony]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.