U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00608-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MCAULIFFE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Probation Order]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Probation Order]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Response to motion]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • February 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • February 03, 2022: [Travel ]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • January 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 20, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Statement of Offense]
  • November 23, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 23, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 23, 2021: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • November 23, 2021: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 18, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 18, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 07, 2021: [.Order]
  • October 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 01, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.